Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Melchior Shi Hongzhen

Bishop of Tianjin [Tientsin], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1929 Born
4 Jul 195425.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 198253.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Tianjin [Tientsin], China
8 Jun 201990.4SucceededBishop of Tianjin [Tientsin], China

MicroData Summary for Melchior Shi Hongzhen
Bishop Melchior Shi Hongzhen (born ) Bishop of Tianjin [Tientsin]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopTianjin, Diocese of Tianjin [Tientsin]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tianjin [Tientsin].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 17
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,875

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast