Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Paul Li De-pei (Li Dipei, Li Debei)] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tianjin [Tientsin], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1901²Born
1925²24.0Ordained PriestPriest
1958²57.0SelectedBishop of Tianjin [Tientsin], China
14 May 196362.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tianjin [Tientsin], China
1983²82.0ResignedBishop of Tianjin [Tientsin], China
13 Jul 1991³90.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Tianjin [Tientsin], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Li De-pei (Li Dipei, Li Debei)
Bishop Paul Li De-pei (Li Dipei, Li Debei) (born 1901, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tianjin [Tientsin]

EventPlace
Death PlaceBeijing, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

  • a priest for 66.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,063
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,692

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast