Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop (Joseph) Stephen Li Side

Deceased

Bishop of Tianjin [Tientsin], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1926Born
17 Jul 195528.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 198255.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tianjin [Tientsin], China
8 Jun 201992.6DiedBishop of Tianjin [Tientsin], China

MicroData Summary for (Joseph) Stephen Li Side
Bishop (Joseph) Stephen Li Side (born , died ) Bishop of Tianjin [Tientsin]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZunhua (Tangshan)
Ordained BishopTianjin, Diocese of Tianjin [Tientsin]
Death PlaceLiang Zhuang Zi

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,101
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 16
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,874
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast