Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Peter Fan Wenxing] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1921Born
1948¹26.9Ordained PriestPriest
1954²32.9SelectedAdministrator of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China
1980²58.9SelectedBishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China
20 Dec 198160.8Ordained BishopBishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China
1999²77.9ResignedBishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China
28 Feb 200685.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Fan Wenxing
Bishop Peter Fan Wenxing (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jingxian [Kinghsien]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopTangshan, Diocese of Yongping [Yüngping]

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,096
  • fn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 30 Dec 2019

Quantcast