Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Mathias Chen Xilu] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Hengshui)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1928Born
18 May 195527.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Oct 199668.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China
1999²70.9SucceededBishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China
16 Jan 200879.9DiedBishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mathias Chen Xilu
Bishop Mathias Chen Xilu (born , died ) Bishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJi County
Ordained BishopHengshui, Diocese of Jingxian [Kinghsien]
Death PlaceJizhou

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 28 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast