Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop John Liu Ding-han], S.J. †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1917Born
1939²21.5EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
7 Jun 1950³33.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1980²62.5SelectedBishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China
10 Oct 198265.3Ordained BishopBishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China
Aug 1992³75.1AppointedAdministrator of [Langfang (Patriotic), China]
1993¹75.5CeasedAdministrator of [Langfang (Patriotic), China]
1998²80.5ResignedBishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China
1999²81.5SelectedBishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China
2000²82.5ResignedBishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China
20 Dec 200790.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Liu Ding-han
Bishop John Liu Ding-han S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Xianxian [Sienhsien]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopKirin, Diocese of Jilin [Kirin]
Death PlaceCangzhou, Diocese of Xianxian [Sienhsien]

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,099
  • l581: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob(sc): Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast