Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Feng Xinmao

Bishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Hengshui)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1963 Born
3 Dec 199835.8Ordained PriestPriest
2002²38.9SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China
6 Jan 200440.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China
16 Jan 200844.9SucceededBishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Feng Xinmao
Bishop Peter Feng Xinmao (born ) Bishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jingxian [Kinghsien].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast