Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Li Lian Gui

Bishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1964 Born
19 Mar 199127.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 200036.1Ordained BishopBishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Li Lian Gui
Bishop Joseph Li Lian Gui (born ) Bishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopXianxian, Diocese of Xianxian [Sienhsien]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Xianxian [Sienhsien].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast