Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Hou Jingwen (Heoujing Wen)

Deceased

Bishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Cangzhou)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1926²Born
28 Oct 195630.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 199367.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China
1998²72.0SucceededBishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China
23 Oct 199973.8DiedBishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Hou Jingwen (Heoujing Wen)
Bishop Peter Hou Jingwen (Heoujing Wen) (born 1926, died ) Bishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSienhsien, Vicariate Apostolic of Sienhsien [Xianxian]
Ordained BishopSienhsien, Diocese of Xianxian [Sienhsien]

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 10 Jan 2020
  • c34: CB, 29 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast