Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Chen Xu (Chen Chu)

Deceased

Bishop of Beihai [Pakhoi], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Zhanjiang)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1922Born
11 Jun 194927.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 199472.6SelectedBishop of Beihai [Pakhoi], China
19 Mar 199573.0Ordained BishopBishop of Beihai [Pakhoi], China
19 Mar 200381.0DiedBishop of Beihai [Pakhoi], China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Chen Xu (Chen Chu)
Bishop Joseph Chen Xu (Chen Chu) (born , died ) Bishop of Beihai [Pakhoi]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopZhanjiang
Death PlaceZhanjiang City

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast