Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Beihai [Pakhoi]

Dioecesis Pehaevensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Guangzhou [Canton]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 22,000 (8,497 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Beihai, Guangdong, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Western Kwangtung and Hainan {Kuangtong Occidentale ed Hainan}
1 August 1920ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Western Kwangtung and Hainan {Kuangtong Occidentale ed Hainan} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Pakhoi [Beihai]
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Western Kwangtung and Hainan {Kuangtong Occidentale ed Hainan} Vicariate Apostolic of Pakhoi [Beihai]
Diocese of Beihai [Pakhoi]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Pakhoi [Beihai] Diocese of Beihai [Pakhoi]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Beihai [Pakhoi]
195015,1053,200,000.5%27275597218ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013