Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Matthew Yu Cheng-cai] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Haimen [Haimen], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1917Born
1946²28.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Apr 1958³40.6SelectedBishop of Haimen [Haimen], China
15 Nov 195942.2Ordained BishopBishop of Haimen [Haimen], China
18 Mar 200688.5DiedBishop of Haimen [Haimen], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matthew Yu Cheng-cai
Bishop Matthew Yu Cheng-cai (born , died ) Bishop of Haimen [Haimen]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShanghai
Ordained BishopNanjing, Archdiocese of Nanjing [Nanking]
Death PlaceNantong

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 46.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 34
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,071

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast