Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Xiao Zejiang

Bishop of Guiyang [Kweyang], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Guizhou)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Oct 1967³ Born
1994²26.2Ordained PriestPriest
Oct 2006³39.0SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Guiyang [Kweyang], China
8 Sep 200739.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Guiyang [Kweyang], China
8 Sep 201446.9SucceededBishop of Guiyang [Kweyang], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Xiao Zejiang
Bishop Paul Xiao Zejiang (born Oct 1967) Bishop of Guiyang [Kweyang]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopGuiyang, Archdiocese of Guiyang [Kweyang]

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Guiyang [Kweyang].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast