Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Cai Bingrui

Bishop of Xiamen [Hsiamen, Amoy], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1966 Born
15 Aug 199225.9Ordained PriestPriest
1996²29.2SelectedAdministrator of Xiamen [Hsiamen, Amoy], China
Jun 2009³42.7SelectedBishop of Xiamen [Hsiamen, Amoy], China
8 May 201043.6Ordained BishopBishop of Xiamen [Hsiamen, Amoy], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Cai Bingrui
Bishop Joseph Cai Bingrui (born ) Bishop of Xiamen [Hsiamen, Amoy]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZhangzhou
Ordained BishopOur Lady of the Rosary, Church, Xiamen, Diocese of Xiamen [Hsiamen, Amoy]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Xiamen [Hsiamen, Amoy].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 27 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,642

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast