Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Cheng Tsai-fa

Archbishop Emeritus of Taipei


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1932 BornHsiamen
21 Dec 195725.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 199058.4AppointedBishop of Tainan, Taiwan
2 Feb 199158.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tainan, Taiwan
24 Jan 200471.6AppointedArchbishop of Taipei, Taiwan
9 Nov 200775.3RetiredArchbishop of Taipei, Taiwan

MicroData Summary for Joseph Cheng Tsai-fa:
Archbishop Joseph Cheng Tsai-fa (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Taipei

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Taipei.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,391

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013