Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Chung An-zu

Bishop of Kiayi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1952 BornYunlin
26 Dec 198129.3Ordained PriestPriest of Tainan, Taiwan
31 Oct 200654.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Taipei, Taiwan
31 Oct 200654.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Munatiana
30 Dec 200654.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Munatiana
24 Jan 200855.4AppointedBishop of Kiayi, Taiwan

MicroData Summary for Thomas Chung An-zu:
Bishop Thomas Chung An-zu (born ) Bishop of Kiayi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kiayi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,303
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015