Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Lee Juo-Wang

Bishop of Tainan, Taiwan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1966 Born
1 Jan 199326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tainan, Taiwan
14 Nov 202054.0AppointedBishop of Tainan, Taiwan
1 Jan 202154.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tainan, Taiwan

MicroData Summary for John Lee Juo-Wang
Bishop John Lee Juo-Wang (born ) Bishop of Tainan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTainan City, Diocese of Tainan
Ordained BishopSheng Kung Girls High School, Tainan, Diocese of Tainan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tainan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2020
  • ob: CB, 20 Nov 2020
  • c2+: CB, 1 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 2 Jan 2021

Quantcast