Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matthew Kia Yen-wen

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Taipei, Taiwan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1925Born
15 Jul 195126.4Ordained PriestPriest of Tainan, Taiwan
21 May 197045.3AppointedBishop of Kiayi, Taiwan
16 Jul 197045.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kiayi, Taiwan
14 Dec 197449.9AppointedBishop of Hwalien, Taiwan
15 Nov 197853.8AppointedArchbishop of Taipei, Taiwan
11 Feb 198964.0ResignedArchbishop of Taipei, Taiwan
22 Aug 201792.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Taipei, Taiwan

MicroData Summary for Matthew Kia Yen-wen
Archbishop Matthew Kia Yen-wen (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Taipei

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYuenshi Hsien
Death PlaceTwalien, Diocese of Hwalien

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 47.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 23 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018