Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Fang Xing Yao

Bishop of Linyi [Ichow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1953 Born
17 Dec 198936.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jul 1997³44.1Ordained BishopBishop of Linyi [Ichow], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Fang Xing Yao
Bishop John Fang Xing Yao (born ) Bishop of Linyi [Ichow]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Linyi [Ichow].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 21 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 26 Jan 2020

Quantcast