Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Liao Hongqing

Bishop of Meixian [Kaying], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Meizhou)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1966 Born
25 Jul 199124.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 200337.1Ordained BishopBishop of Meixian [Kaying], China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Liao Hongqing
Bishop Joseph Liao Hongqing (born ) Bishop of Meixian [Kaying]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopMeizhou, Diocese of Meixian [Kaying]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Meixian [Kaying].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast