Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Gan Junqiu

Bishop of Guangzhou [Canton], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1964³ Born
19 May 199127.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 200743.6AppointedBishop of Guangzhou [Canton], China
4 Dec 200743.6Ordained BishopBishop of Guangzhou [Canton], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Gan Junqiu
Bishop Joseph Gan Junqiu (born Apr 1964) Bishop of Guangzhou [Canton]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopGuangzhou, Archdiocese of Guangzhou [Canton]

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Guangzhou [Canton].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 20 Jan 2020

Quantcast