Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Huang Bingzhang

Coadjutor Bishop of Shantou [Swatow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jan 1967³ Born
1991²24.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 201144.3SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Shantou [Swatow], China
14 Jul 201144.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Shantou [Swatow], China
22 Sep 201851.7ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Shantou [Swatow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Huang Bingzhang
Bishop Joseph Huang Bingzhang (born Jan 1967) Coadjutor Bishop of Shantou [Swatow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHan, Guandong province
Ordained BishopShantou, Diocese of Shantou [Swatow]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Shantou [Swatow].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 22 Sep 2018
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Sep 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 24 Sep 2018

Quantcast