Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Lei Jiapei

Bishop of Xichang [Ningyüan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1970² Born
24 Dec 199525.9Ordained PriestPriest
2010²40.0SelectedBishop of Xichang [Ningyüan], China
2015²45.0AppointedAdministrator of Xichang [Ningyüan], China
2016²46.0AppointedBishop of Xichang [Ningyüan], China
2 Dec 201646.9Ordained BishopBishop of Xichang [Ningyüan], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Lei Jiapei
Bishop John Lei Jiapei (born 1970) Bishop of Xichang [Ningyüan]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopXichang, Diocese of Xichang [Ningyüan]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Xichang [Ningyüan].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast