Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Zhao Fengchang

Bishop of Yanggu [Yangku], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1934 Born
29 Sep 198551.6Ordained PriestPriest
1999²64.8SelectedBishop of Yanggu [Yangku], China
7 May 200066.2Ordained BishopBishop of Yanggu [Yangku], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Zhao Fengchang
Bishop Joseph Zhao Fengchang (born ) Bishop of Yanggu [Yangku]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJining, Diocese of Jining [Tsining]
Ordained BishopLiaocheng

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Yanggu [Yangku].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 21 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast