Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Yanggu [Yangku]

Dioecesis Iamcuvensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 3,244 (1,252 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Po-Li-Chwan, Yanggu, Shandong, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Yangku [Yanggu]
13 December 1933ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Yangku [Yanggu] (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Yangku [Yanggu]
11 July 1939ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Yangku [Yanggu] Vicariate Apostolic of Yangku [Yanggu]
Diocese of Yanggu [Yangku]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Yangku [Yanggu] Diocese of Yanggu [Yangku]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Yanggu [Yangku]
196010,2371,430,000.7%411253193264ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 2 Sep 2012