Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Francis Lu Shouwang] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Yichang [Ichang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1966Born
19 May 199125.2Ordained PriestPriest
2005²38.8SelectedAdministrator of Yichang [Ichang], China
Dec 2006³40.7SelectedBishop of Yichang [Ichang], China
30 Nov 200741.7Ordained BishopBishop of Yichang [Ichang], China
30 Apr 201145.1DiedBishop of Yichang [Ichang], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francis Lu Shouwang
Bishop Francis Lu Shouwang (born , died ) Bishop of Yichang [Ichang]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopYichang, Diocese of Yichang [Ichang]
Death PlaceWuhan

  • a priest for 19.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast