Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Yu Ren Shen (Yu Runchen)

Bishop of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1931 Born
8 Dec 195726.0Ordained PriestPriest
1985²53.0SelectedBishop of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China
30 Nov 198654.9Ordained BishopBishop of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China
14 Sep 200977.7SucceededBishop of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis Yu Ren Shen (Yu Runchen)
Bishop Louis Yu Ren Shen (Yu Runchen) (born ) Bishop of Hanzhong [Hanchung]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBeijing, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hanzhong [Hanchung].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast