Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Ye Ronghua

Bishop of Ankang [Hinganfu], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1931 Born
1982²50.5Ordained PriestPriest
1987²55.5AppointedAdministrator of Ankang [Hinganfu], China
10 Dec 200069.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ankang [Hinganfu], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Ye Ronghua
Bishop John Baptist Ye Ronghua (born ) Bishop of Ankang [Hinganfu]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHanzhong
Ordained BishopAnkang, Prefecture Apostolic of Ankang [Hinganfu]

Please contact the Bishop through the Prefecture Apostolic of Ankang [Hinganfu].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast