Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Yang Xiaoting

Bishop of Yan’an [Yenan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1964 Born
1991²26.7Ordained PriestPriest
2006²41.7SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Yan’an [Yenan], China
15 Jul 201046.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Yan’an [Yenan], China
30 Sep 201046.4SucceededBishop of Yan’an [Yenan], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Yang Xiaoting
Bishop John Baptist Yang Xiaoting (born ) Bishop of Yan’an [Yenan]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopYan’an, Diocese of Yan’an [Yenan]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Yan’an [Yenan].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast