Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Xu Hongwei

Coadjutor Bishop of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1975 Born
11 Jul 200227.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 201944.2SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China
28 Aug 201944.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China

MicroData Summary for Stephen Xu Hongwei
Bishop Stephen Xu Hongwei (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Hanzhong [Hanchung]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSaint Michael, Cathedral, Hanzhong, Diocese of Hanzhong [Hanchung]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hanzhong [Hanchung].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,233
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 26 Jan 2020

Quantcast