Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Han Yingjin

Bishop of Sanyuan [SanyŁan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1958² Born
8 Nov 199234.8Ordained PriestPriest of Sanyuan [SanyŁan], China
2007²49.0SelectedBishop of Sanyuan [SanyŁan], China
2008²50.0ConfirmedBishop of Sanyuan [SanyŁan], China
24 Jun 201052.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sanyuan [SanyŁan], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Han Yingjin
Bishop Joseph Han Yingjin (born 1958) Bishop of Sanyuan [SanyŁan]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanyuan, Diocese of Sanyuan [SanyŁan]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sanyuan [SanyŁan].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 8 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 26 Jan 2020

Quantcast