Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Zhu Weifang

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Yongjia/Wenzhou [Yungkia], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Wenzhou)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1927Born
6 Oct 195426.8Ordained PriestPriest
Nov 2007³79.8SelectedBishop of Yongjia/Wenzhou [Yungkia], China
10 Jan 200981.0Ordained BishopBishop of Yongjia/Wenzhou [Yungkia], China
23 Nov 201082.9InstalledBishop of Yongjia/Wenzhou [Yungkia], China
2016²88.0RetiredBishop of Yongjia/Wenzhou [Yungkia], China
7 Sep 201688.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Yongjia/Wenzhou [Yungkia], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincent Zhu Weifang
Bishop Vincent Zhu Weifang (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Yongjia/Wenzhou [Yungkia]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYang’ao/Yongjia
Death PlaceWenzhous

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2017, Page 1,141
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Sep 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,109
  • c1/loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 24 Sep 2018

Quantcast