Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Xu Jiwei

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Linhai [Taichow], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Taizhou)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1935Born
21 Nov 198550.6Ordained PriestPriest
1999²63.7SelectedAdministrator of Linhai [Taichow], China
10 Jul 201075.2Ordained BishopBishop of Linhai [Taichow], China
25 Sep 201681.4DiedBishop of Linhai [Taichow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anthony Xu Jiwei
Bishop Anthony Xu Jiwei (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Linhai [Taichow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShanghai
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Taizhou
Death PlaceTaizhou

  • a priest for 30.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2017, Page 1,141
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Sep 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,756
  • op/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 24 Sep 2018

Quantcast