Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Ma Xue-sheng

Deceased

Bishop of Zhoucun [Chowtsun], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1923Born
1957²33.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 198864.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Zhoucun [Chowtsun], China
27 Jun 199773.7SucceededBishop of Zhoucun [Chowtsun], China
8 Feb 201389.3DiedBishop of Zhoucun [Chowtsun], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ma Xue-sheng
Bishop Joseph Ma Xue-sheng (born , died ) Bishop of Zhoucun [Chowtsun]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZouping county
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tsinan, Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan]

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast