Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Xing Wenzhi

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Shanghai [Shanghai], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1963 Born
2 Jun 199027.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jun 200542.1Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China
2011²47.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Xing Wenzhi
Bishop Joseph Xing Wenzhi (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Shanghai [Shanghai]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZhoucun
Ordained BishopShanghai, Diocese of Shanghai [Shanghai]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Shanghai [Shanghai].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast