Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Li Mingshu

Deceased

Bishop of Qingdao [Tsingtao], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1924Born
11 Apr 194924.3Ordained PriestPriest
1994²69.0SelectedAdministrator of Qingdao [Tsingtao], China
13 Aug 200075.6Ordained BishopBishop of Qingdao [Tsingtao], China
15 Jun 201893.5DiedBishop of Qingdao [Tsingtao], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Li Mingshu
Bishop Joseph Li Mingshu (born , died ) Bishop of Qingdao [Tsingtao]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLicun/Lijia, Binzhou (Shandong)
Ordained BishopSaint Michael, Cathedral, Qingdao, Diocese of Qingdao [Tsingtao]

  • a priest for 69.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 21 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,818
  • bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast