Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Yichang [Ichang]

Dioecesis Iciamensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Hankow [Hankou]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 28,000 (10,815 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Yichang, Hubei, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Hupeh {Hu-P Occiduo-Meridionale}
2 September 1870SplitVicariate Apostolic of Hupeh {Hu-P} Vicariate Apostolic of Northwestern Hupeh {Hu-P Occiduo-Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Hupeh {Hu-P Occiduo-Meridionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Hupeh {Hu-P Orientale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Ichang [Yichang]
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Hupeh {Hu-P Occiduo-Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Ichang [Yichang]
Diocese of Yichang [Ichang]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Ichang [Yichang] Diocese of Yichang [Ichang]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Yichang [Ichang]
195015,0785,000,000.3%15425726477156ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 29 Nov 2012