Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John Baptist Hou

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Shihnan [Enshi], China

Titular Bishop of Abbir Maius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1881Born
1910²28.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Feb 194058.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Shihnan [Enshi], China
13 Feb 194058.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Abbir Maius
10 Nov 194261.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Shihnan [Enshi], China
1950¹68.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Shihnan [Enshi], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Hou
Father John Baptist Hou (born , died 1950) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Shihnan [Enshi]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHukiahwi, Vicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Meridionale}

  • a priest for 40.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,940
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,950, Page 416
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,951, Page 436
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 10 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast