Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theotimus Jozef Verhaegen, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Meridionale}

Titular Bishop of Syene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1867BornMalines, Belgium
5 Oct 188720.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
22 Mar 189023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
27 Apr 190033.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Meridionale}, China
27 Apr 190033.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Syene
11 Nov 190033.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Syene
19 Jul 190437.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Meridionale}, China

MicroData Summary for Theotimus Jozef Verhaegen:
Bishop Theotimus Jozef Verhaegen O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Meridionale}

  • a priest for 14.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 530

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013