Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Xavier Maresca, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China

Titular Bishop of Soli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1805¹Born
27 Mar 184641.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China
27 Mar 184641.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Soli
23 May 184742.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Soli
2 Nov 185550.8DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Xavier Maresca
Bishop Francesco Xavier Maresca O.F.M. (born 1805, died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Nanking [Nanjing]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Ordained BishopKin-ka-kang
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 349
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 17
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 919

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast