Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simeone Volonteri, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Honan {Ho-Nan Meridionale}

Titular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1831BornMilan
1855¹23.6Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
1869¹37.6AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Honan {Ho-Nan}, China
22 Jul 187342.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Honan {Ho-Nan}, China
22 Jul 187342.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia
22 Feb 187442.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia
1 Sep 188251.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Honan {Ho-Nan Meridionale}, China
21 Dec 190473.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Honan {Ho-Nan Meridionale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simeone Volonteri:
Bishop Simeone Volonteri P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Honan {Ho-Nan Meridionale}

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 435

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013