Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Jixian [Weihwei]

Dioecesis Ueihoeivensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kaifeng [Kaifeng]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Jixian, Henan, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Honan {Ho-Nan}
2 March 1844ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Honan {Ho-Nan} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Honan {Ho-Nan Settentrionale}
28 August 1882SplitVicariate Apostolic of Honan {Ho-Nan} Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Honan {Ho-Nan Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Honan {Ho-Nan Meridionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Weihweifu
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Honan {Ho-Nan Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Nganhoei
Vicariate Apostolic of Weihweifu
Vicariate Apostolic of Wuhu [Wuhu]
Diocese of Jixian [Weihwei]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Weihweifu Diocese of Jixian [Weihwei]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Jixian [Weihwei]
195046,0002,500,0001.8%1712291,58648ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013