Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luke Thomas Zhang Huaixin (Kexing)

Deceased

Bishop of Jixian [Weihwei], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Anyang)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1925Born
19 Oct 195025.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Oct 198156.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jixian [Weihwei], China
8 May 201690.9DiedBishop of Jixian [Weihwei], China

MicroData Summary for Luke Thomas Zhang Huaixin (Kexing)
Bishop Luke Thomas Zhang Huaixin (Kexing) (born , died ) Bishop of Jixian [Weihwei]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLiangbudaying, Diocese of Jixian [Weihwei]
Death PlaceAnyang, Diocese of Jixian [Weihwei]

  • a priest for 65.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2017, Page 1,141
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Sep 2018
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,696
  • b/c2: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 8 May 2020

Quantcast