Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Li Hongye

Deceased

Bishop of Luoyang [Loyang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1919Born
20 Apr 1944³25.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Aug 1987³68.5Ordained BishopBishop of Luoyang [Loyang], China
23 Apr 201192.2DiedBishop of Luoyang [Loyang], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Li Hongye
Bishop Peter Li Hongye (born , died ) Bishop of Luoyang [Loyang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHu Tuo Gong Xian
Death PlaceLoyang, Diocese of Luoyang [Loyang]

  • a priest for 67.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Dec 2019
  • b/c23: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 27 Dec 2019

Quantcast