Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Zhu Baoyu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nanyang [Nanyang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1921Born
1957²35.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Mar 199573.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Nanyang [Nanyang], China
21 Nov 200281.3AppointedBishop of Nanyang [Nanyang], China
2010²88.4RetiredBishop of Nanyang [Nanyang], China
30 Jun 201189.9InstalledBishop of Nanyang [Nanyang], China
7 May 202098.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Nanyang [Nanyang], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Zhu Baoyu
Bishop Joseph Zhu Baoyu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nanyang [Nanyang]

EventPlace
Birth PlacePushan
Death PlaceNanyang, Diocese of Nanyang [Nanyang]

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • b/c2+: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 77
  • d: CB, 7 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 8 May 2020

Quantcast