Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Jin Dechen

Deceased

Bishop of Nanyang [Nanyang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1919Born
1944¹24.5Ordained PriestPriest
1981²61.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nanyang [Nanyang], China
21 Nov 200283.4DiedBishop of Nanyang [Nanyang], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Jin Dechen
Bishop Joseph Jin Dechen (born , died ) Bishop of Nanyang [Nanyang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJingang village

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 22 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 8, 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 8 May 2020

Quantcast