Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Navarro, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Honan {Ho-Nan}

Titular Bishop of Cucusus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1809BornGranada, Spain
25 Nov 182718.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
8 Apr 185646.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Honan {Ho-Nan}, China
8 Apr 185646.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cucusus
7 Dec 185647.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cucusus
9 Sep 187768.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Honan {Ho-Nan}, China

MicroData Summary for Miguel Navarro:
Bishop Miguel Navarro O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Honan {Ho-Nan}

  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 232
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 164, Number 898

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013