Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ezechias Banci, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Settentrionale}

Titular Bishop of Halicarnassus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1833BornSemproniano, Italy
1854¹20.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
1857¹23.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
29 May 187138.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Hunan {Hu-Nan}, China
29 May 187138.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Halicarnassus
15 May 187239.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Halicarnassus
23 Sep 187946.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Settentrionale}, China
22 Sep 190370.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Northwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Settentrionale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ezechias Banci:
Bishop Ezechias Banci O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Settentrionale}

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 298

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013