Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Scarella, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Honan {Ho-Nan Meridionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Carpasia

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Honan {Ho-Nan Settentrionale}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1842Born
10 Dec 186422.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Aug 186523.0Ordained PriestPriest
1870¹27.3ProfessedPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
1 Sep 188240.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Honan {Ho-Nan Meridionale}, China
1 Sep 188240.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Carpasia
8 Jan 188441.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Honan {Ho-Nan Settentrionale}, China
19 Mar 188441.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carpasia
21 Sep 190260.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Honan {Ho-Nan Settentrionale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano Scarella (VIAF: 307402280)
Bishop Stefano Scarella P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Honan {Ho-Nan Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarpasio, Italy

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 184
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017