Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Maria Imparati, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1838Born
10 Jul 185921.0Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
16 Mar 186122.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
27 Feb 188041.6AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
7 Mar 188041.6Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
23 Jun 189051.9AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
11 Jul 189254.0DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Imparati
Archbishop Francesco Maria Imparati O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalerno
Ordained BishopS. Maria in ara coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 73, and Page 585
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Mar 2017